VA SB935 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Herndon; elections. Moves the date of election of the mayor and members of the town council from May to November beginning with the election of November 2016 and extends the terms of those in office as of July 2016 until December 31, 2016. The bill also provides for the election of a vice mayor at the first regular town council meeting in January following a municipal election.
Title
Herndon, Town of; amending charter, moves election date of mayor and council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (63-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to (63-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102253D |