VA SB926 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Notice provisions; third party commercial carrier. Provides that, in Titles 16.1, 17.1, 18.2, and 19.2, when service, delivery, or transmission of any notice or paper in any proceeding is authorized to be accomplished by mail, ordinary mail, registered mail, or certified mail, then service, delivery, or transmission by a third party commercial carrier is deemed to be authorized by such provision. This bill is a recommendation of the Code Commission.
Title
Notice provisions; third party commercial carrier.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100043D-E |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB926E |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100043D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 6.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 5.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |