VA SB926 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Office of the Attorney General; employment of special counsel. Limits the contingency fee that may be charged by special counsel employed by a state agency, depending on the amount recovered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special counsel; contingency fees for those employed by a state agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 51-N) (Y: 46 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateRequires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
2018-04-18SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N)
2018-03-19 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-05SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB926ER)
2018-03-01SenateEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 48-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House (51-Y 48-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed by temporarily
2018-02-28HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 51-N)
2018-02-28HouseDefeated by House (46-Y 51-N)
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseTaken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (95-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseConstitutional reading dispensed (95-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseReported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2018-02-26HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N)
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2018-02-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2018-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB926S1
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106882D-S1
2018-02-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-09SenateRead second time
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106882D-S1
2018-02-07SenateReported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N)
2018-02-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-05SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104273D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22507(n/a)See Bill Text
22510(n/a)See Bill Text
22510.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22510.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB926
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB926+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB926S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB926ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0265+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0199+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0448SB0926+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0368SB0926+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0802V0111+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0591+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0204V0024+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0196+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1087+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1101+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1117+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1120+SB0926
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1248SB0926+SB0926

Bill Comments

feedback