VA SB924 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Standards for the display of the Honor and Remember Flag at state buildings and facilities outside of Capitol Square. Provides that in the absence of a directive from the Governor or the Director of the Department of General Services, the head of the state agency that controls any facility or building outside of Capitol Square may determine when to display the Honor and Remember Flag, provided that the Honor and Remember Flag that is displayed is (i) smaller in height and width than the flag of the United States that is officially displayed at the building or facility and (ii) made in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor & Remember Flag; standards for display at state buildings, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB924ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09SenateReported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104096D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB924
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB924+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB924ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0687+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S10V0053+SB0924
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0410SB0924+SB0924
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0480SB0924+SB0924
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0481SB0924+SB0924
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1101V0073+SB0924
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0270+SB0924
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1334+SB0924

Bill Comments

feedback