VA SB917 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB917
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reproductive health services. Requires health benefit plans to cover the costs of specified health care services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures related to reproductive health. The health benefit plan requirements become effective when a plan is delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended in the Commonwealth on and after January 1, 2021, or at any time thereafter when any term of the health benefit plan is changed or any premium adjustment is made. The measure also requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance services a provision for the payment of the costs of a reproductive health care program providing reimbursement for medically necessary reproductive health care services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures for eligible individuals.
Title
Reproductive health services; health benefit plans to cover costs of specified health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104258D |
Same As/Similar To
SB917 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3451 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |