VA SB915 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Tabled in General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Tabled in General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Barbers and cosmetologists; training requirement. Prohibits the Board for Barbers and Cosmetology from requiring completion of more than 1,200 hours of training in the field for which an applicant for a license to practice barbering or cosmetology seeks licensing. The bill also requires that certain licensed cosmetologists certify to the Board every two years that they have completed at least four hours of Board-approved continuing education. The bill has a delayed effective date of December 1, 2020.
Title
Cosmetologists; training requirement, continuing education, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Tabled in General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Tabled in General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Tabled in General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Tabled in General Laws (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB915S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106350D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106350D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104642D |