VA SB915 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Priority Needs Access Program. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to amend the Medicaid demonstration project (Project Number 11-W-00297/3) to create the Priority Needs Access Program to (i) increase the income eligibility for adults with serious mental illness from 100 to 138 percent of the federal poverty level; (ii) expand program eligibility to individuals with a diagnosis of mental illness, substance use disorder, or a life-threatening or complex chronic medical condition; (iii) include in the benefit package inpatient hospital and emergency room services; (iv) and include the demonstration project in the Commonwealth Coordinated Care Plus managed care program. The bill also directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to add 144 new Community Living waiver slots, 1,847 new Family and Individual Support waiver slots, and 305 new Building Independent waiver slots; the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish and operate a statewide alternative transportation system for adults and children who are subject to temporary detention orders; the Department of Medical Assistance Services to ensure that children in the Medicaid and FAMIS programs are screened for adverse childhood experiences; and the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to expand neurobehavioral services used to assist persons with brain injuries in returning to work and community living and avoid inappropriate institutionalization of persons with brain injuries. The bill will not become effective unless an appropriation effectuating its purposes is included in the general appropriations act passed in 2018 by the General Assembly that becomes law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance; increase access to certain services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateFailed to pass
2018-03-10SenateNo further action taken
2018-03-08HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-07HouseRead second time
2018-03-05HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 18107129D-S2
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB915S2
2018-02-13SenateSubstitute by Senators Dunnavant and Chase agreed to 18107129D-S2
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateFloor substitute printed 18107129D-S2 (Dunnavant and Chase)
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18106996D-S1
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106996D-S1
2018-02-12SenateReported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N)
2018-02-01SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-01SenateReported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105040D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321331.18(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback