VA SB914 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB914
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Petition for vacatur and expungement of convictions and police and court records of victims of human trafficking. Allows any person who was a victim of human trafficking at the time of an offense that led to a criminal charge or conviction of certain crimes to petition the court to vacate such conviction and expunge the police and court records related to such conviction or to expunge the police and court records related to such charge. The bill provides that there is a rebuttable presumption that a person's participation in an offense was a result of having been a victim of human trafficking if there is official documentation, defined in the bill, of the petitioner's status as a victim of human trafficking at the time of the offense.
Title
Victim of human trafficking; petition for vacatur/expungement of convictions & police/court records.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104541D |
Same As/Similar To
SB914 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |