VA SB910 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Instructional positions; students identified as having limited English proficiency. Requires, effective with the 2020-2021 school year, state funding to be provided pursuant to the general appropriation act to support 18.5 full-time equivalent instructional positions for each 1,000 students identified as having limited English proficiency and, effective with the 2021-2022 school year, 20 full-time equivalent instructional positions for each 1,000 students identified as having limited English proficiency. Current law requires state funding to support 17 such positions for each 1,000 such students.
Title
Standards of Quality; state funding, ratios of teachers to English language learners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1035) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1035 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB910ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 20108573D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB910H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20108573D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee on Education amendment rejected |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108573D-H1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105822D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB910ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105822D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105822D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20102725D |
Same As/Similar To
HB975 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1034)