VA SB91 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Application of parole statutes. Repeals the abolition of parole. The bill also provides that the Virginia Parole Board shall establish procedures for consideration of parole for persons who were previously ineligible for parole, because parole was abolished, to allow for an extension of time for reasonable cause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole; application of statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateIncorporates SB809 (Morrissey)
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20107456D-S1
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-10SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2020-01-10SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-11-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-11-27SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100438D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531165.1(n/a)See Bill Text
531165.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback