VA SB905 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; tenant's remedy by repair. Permits a tenant, under certain circumstances, to have a condition that constitutes a material noncompliance by the landlord with the rental agreement or with provisions of law, or that if not promptly corrected will constitute a fire hazard or serious threat to the life, health, or safety of occupants of the premises, remedied by a third-party licensed contractor or a licensed pesticide business. The bill provides that, unless the tenant has been reimbursed by the landlord, the tenant may deduct from rent the actual costs incurred, not to exceed the greater of one month's rent or $1,500, after submitting to the landlord an itemized statement accompanied by receipts for purchased items and third-party contractor or pest control services.
Title
Landlord and tenant; tenant's remedy by repair, clarifies definition of "actual costs."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 38-N) (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1020) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1020 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB905ER) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 38-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (54-Y 38-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109798D-S2 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Aird, Simon, Wampler |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Stanley, Mason, Kiggans |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House with substitute (55-Y 41-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB905H1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108421D-H1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108421D-H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB905S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107742D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107742D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104774D |