VA SB905 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial rest areas. Prohibits a private entity from operating a rest area for commercial purposes without the approval of the General Assembly. The bill provides that the prohibition does not apply to any program or contract between a private entity and an agency or political subdivision of the Commonwealth authorized pursuant to federal law, regulation, or policy as of July 1, 2018. This bill is identical to HB 1522.
Title
Commercial rest areas; prohibits a private entity from operating for commercial purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 351 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB905ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18104023D-E |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB905E |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104023D |