VA SB904 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; public institutions of higher education; dyslexia and literacy; multisensory structured language education. Directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to facilitate the development of a statewide coalition of public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, by December 1, 2020, to gather and share information on the latest evidence-based methods and approaches to prepare teachers to effectively educate K-12 students in reading, including multisensory structured language education to instruct students with dyslexia. The bill allows each public institution's school of education, education department, or relevant department for the career paths of K-12 reading specialists and teachers to collect such information and collaborate with other public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth regarding the latest reliable research for reading instruction to all K-12 students, with an emphasis on improving reading instruction to students with dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; dyslexia and literacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB904ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02SenateTitle replaced 20109314D-H2
2020-03-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HousePassed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB904H2
2020-02-28HouseSubstitute by Delegate Keam agreed to 20109314D-H2
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute rejected 20108906D-H1
2020-02-28HouseRead third time
2020-02-28HouseFloor substitute printed 20109314D-H2 (Keam)
2020-02-27HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-27HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108906D-H1
2020-02-24HouseReported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB904S1
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107622D-S1
2020-02-10SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107622D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-08SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104687D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB904&201+sum+SB904
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB904+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB904S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB904H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB904H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB904ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0584+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0147+SB0904
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0410SB0904+SB0904
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0450SB0904+SB0904
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0451SB0904+SB0904
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0244+SB0904
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1618+SB0904
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1355SB0904+SB0904

Bill Comments

feedback