VA SB903 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0942)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0942)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals; emergency treatment for substance use-related emergencies; services. Requires the Board of Health to amend regulations governing hospitals to require each hospital with an emergency department to establish a protocol for treatment of individuals experiencing a substance use-related emergency to include the completion of appropriate assessments or screenings to identify medical interventions necessary for the treatment of the individual in the emergency department. The protocol may also include a process for patients that are discharged directly from the emergency department for the recommendation of follow-up care following discharge for any identified substance use disorder, depression, or mental health disorder, as appropriate, which may include instructions for distribution of naloxone, referrals to peer recovery specialists and community-based providers of behavioral health services, or referrals for pharmacotherapy for treatment of drug or alcohol dependence or mental health diagnoses.
Title
Hospitals; screening emergency department patients, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0942) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 942 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB903ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB903S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106163D-S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106163D-S1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20100720D |