VA SB903 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act. Creates the Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act. The bill allows fiduciaries to manage digital property such as computer files, web domains, and virtual currency, and restricts a fiduciary's access to electronic communications such as email, text messages, and social media accounts unless the original user consented to such access in a will, trust, power of attorney, or other record. The bill repeals the Privacy Expectation Afterlife and Choices Act, which was enacted in 2015. This bill is identical to HB 1608.
Title
Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/17 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB903ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100085D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1622 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |