VA SB902 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax exemption for solar energy equipment and facilities. Limits the property tax exemption for solar equipment and facilities owned and operated by a business, which exemption currently applies to 80 percent of the assessed value of certain projects, to those projects equaling less than 150 megawatts. The 150-megawatt cap applies only to projects for which an initial interconnection request form was filed on or after July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax; exemption for solar energy equipment and facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (83-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 849 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB902ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 13-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (48-Y 50-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB902ER)
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled
2018-03-02SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 13-N 1-A)
2018-02-28HousePassed House with amendment (84-Y 13-N 1-A)
2018-02-28HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House with amendment (85-Y 14-N)
2018-02-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-02-28HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-26HouseReported from Finance with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
2018-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A)
2018-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB902S1
2018-01-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105667D-S1
2018-01-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-26SenateRead second time
2018-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105667D-S1
2018-01-24SenateReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105004D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB902
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB902+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB902S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB902ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB902ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0849+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0044+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0131SB0902+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0195SB0902+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1001V0046+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0138+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1186+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1190+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0857SB0902+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1241SB0902+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1681+SB0902
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1683+SB0902

Bill Comments

feedback