VA SB900 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on December 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 780, 2016 Acts of Assembly.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.30 Item 120 #1s) (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.26 Item 109 #1s) (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.30 Item 120 #1s) (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.26 Item 109 #1s) (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Reeves rejected |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Wexton withdrawn |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment passed by for the day (P.117 Item 442 #8s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.134 Item 478.30 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.124 Item 475 #5s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.119 Item 453 #3s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.116 Item 442 #4s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.100 Item 365 #4s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment reconsidered (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.79 Item 306 #15s) (24-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.77 Item 306 #14s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.73 Item 306 #6s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P. 65 Item 295 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P. 62 Item 285 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.57 Item 281 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.51 Item 238 #3s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.37 Item 139 #2s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.32 Item 125.10 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.30 Item 120 #1s) (25-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.30 Item 116 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.28 Item 111 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.26 Item 109 #1s) (36-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (P.20 Item 86 #4s) (P.20 Item 86 #5s) (P.21 Item 86 #6s) (P.20 Item 86 #7s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendments agreed to (P.20 Item 86 #2s) (p.20 Item 86 #3s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.19 Item 86 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.13 Item 53 #1s) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Uncontested committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Budget amendments available |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103277D |