VA SB9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-20 - Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utility regulation; suspension of reviews of earnings; transitional rate period. Provides that the transitional rate period for Virginia Electric and Power Company (Dominion) will conclude on December 31, 2018, and its next biennial review will be conducted in 2019. The transitional rate period for Dominion currently is scheduled to expire on December 31, 2019, and its next biennial review is scheduled to occur in 2022. The measure does not change the date Appalachian Power's transitional rate period is scheduled to conclude (December 31, 2017), but does advance the year of its next biennial review from 2020 to 2018. During the first biennial reviews after the conclusion of the transitional rate period, the State Corporation Commission shall review the earnings of the utilities during the Transitional Rate Period and order adjustments to rates or credits to customers, if warranted. Pursuant to the 2015 legislation, the State Corporation Commission is barred from conducting a biennial review of the rates, terms, and conditions for any service of an electric utility during its transitional rate period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utility regulation; suspension of reviews of earnings, transitional rate period.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100025D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback