VA SB899 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; markups. Allows the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to round the final price of each container of alcoholic beverages it sells to end with a nine after including a reasonable markup and applicable taxes. Under current law, the final price may be a multiple of five.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; markups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 21 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB899ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102742D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1440 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)