VA SB896 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Volunteer Firefighters' and Rescue Squad Workers' Service Award Fund Board; meetings. Requires the Volunteer Firefighters' and Rescue Squad Workers' Service Award Fund Board to meet at least annually. Current law requires the Board to meet at least quarterly.
Title
Volunteer Firefighters' and Rescue Squad Workers' Service Award Fund Board; meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 209 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB896ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101756D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Pensions Benefits and Retirement
Rescue Squads
Retirement Systems
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Pensions Benefits and Retirement
Rescue Squads
Retirement Systems