VA SB895 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Punitive damages cap. Raises the punitive damages cap from $350,000 to $500,000 for any action accruing on or after July 1, 2018.
Title
Punitive damages; raises cap from $350,000 to $500,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18105038D-E |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB895E |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105038D |