VA SB894 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Energy Efficiency Revolving Fund. Creates the Virginia Energy Efficiency Revolving Fund to provide no-interest loans to any locality, school division, or public institution of higher education for energy conservation or efficiency projects.
Title
Virginia Energy Efficiency Revolving Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | Senate | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB894S1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106396D-S1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106396D-S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105086D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 818 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 241.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 241.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |