VA SB89 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Civil proceedings involving child abuse or neglect; testimony of children. Adds proceedings involving family abuse protective orders to the list of civil proceedings involving alleged abuse and neglect of a child for which a court may order that the testimony of certain child victims or witnesses be taken outside the courtroom via two-way closed-circuit television.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse or neglect; civil proceedings, testimony of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2017-12-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-12-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100993D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321521(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback