VA SB889 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permit fees; exemptions; retired probation and parole officers. Exempts retired probation and parole officers who have completed 15 years of service from concealed handgun permit application fees.
Title
Concealed handgun permit fees; exemptions; retired probation and parole officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 241 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB889ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House (85-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100219D |
Subjects
Concealed Weapons
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Handguns
Parole and Probation
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Weapons
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Handguns
Parole and Probation
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Weapons