VA SB886 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Paid sick leave; health care providers and grocery store workers. Requires employers to provide paid sick leave to health care providers and grocery store workers. Under current law, employers are only required to provide paid sick leave to certain home health workers. The bill removes requirements that workers work on average at least 20 hours per week or 90 hours per month to be eligible for paid sick leave. Under the bill, an employee of an employer with fewer than 25 employees is not considered a grocery store worker. The bill provides that certain health care providers may waive their right to accrue and use paid sick leave and provides an exemption for employers of certain other health care providers. The bill requires the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines for retail employers that sell groceries to provide sick leave and to publish such guidelines by December 1, 2023. The provisions of the bill other than the requirement for the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024. Paid sick leave; health care providers and grocery store workers. Requires employers to provide paid sick leave to health care providers and grocery store workers. Under current law, employers are only required to provide paid sick leave to certain home health workers. The bill removes requirements that workers work on average at least 20 hours per week or 90 hours per month to be eligible for paid sick leave. Under the bill, an employee of an employer with fewer than 25 employees is not considered a grocery store worker. The bill provides that certain health care providers may waive their right to accrue and use paid sick leave and provides an exemption for employers of certain other health care providers. The bill requires the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines for retail employers that sell groceries to provide sick leave and to publish such guidelines by December 1, 2023. The provisions of the bill other than the requirement for the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024.
Title
Health care providers and grocery store workers; employers to provide paid sick leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned sub: Special Subcommittee #5 |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102622D-E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB886E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102622D |