VA SB884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Teledentistry. Defines "teledentistry," establishes requirements for the practice of teledentistry, establishes requirements for the taking of dental scans for use in teledentistry by dental scan technicians, and clarifies requirements related to the use of digital work orders for dental appliances in the practice of teledentistry. The bill also requires the Board of Dentistry to review all applications for renewal of a license to identify those applicants who deliver dental services through teledentistry and report such information annually by October 1 to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions, the Senate Committee on Education and Health, and the Joint Commission on Health Care.
Title
Teledentistry; definition, report, dental scans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Education and Health (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Incorporated by Education and Health |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104192D |
Same As/Similar To
SB122 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2708.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2708.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |