VA SB883 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia-Korea Advisory Board. Establishes the Virginia-Korea Advisory Board to advise the Governor on ways to improve mutually beneficial trade relationships between the Commonwealth and the Republic of Korea (South Korea). The Board would expire on July 1, 2018. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a 2015 general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia-Korea Advisory Board; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15104379D-ES1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB883ES1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104379D-S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104379D-S1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100876D |