VA SB880 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Local ability to pay; certain counties. Requires that the composite index of local ability to pay for any county within which there is a school division composed of a town be calculated as if there were no such school division composed of a town within the county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Composite index; local ability to pay for certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Finance
2018-02-07SenateContinued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 18106484D-S1
2018-02-01SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-01SenateRereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104258D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22198.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback