VA SB880 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local ability to pay; certain counties. Requires that the composite index of local ability to pay for any county within which there is a school division composed of a town be calculated as if there were no such school division composed of a town within the county.
Title
Composite index; local ability to pay for certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 18106484D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104258D |