VA SB878 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health services in local and regional correctional facilities. Requires the Board of Corrections to adopt standards for mental health services in local and regional correctional facilities, which shall include a requirement that (i) the sheriff of every county and city in which a local correctional facility is located enter into an agreement with the community services board serving that county or city for the delivery of mental health and substance abuse services in the local correctional facility and (ii) the administrator of every regional correctional facility enter into an agreement with the community services board or boards serving the counties and cities participating in the regional correctional facility for the delivery of mental health and substance abuse services in the regional correctional facility. If a sheriff contracts with an entity other than a community services board for the provision of mental health and substance abuse services, the sheriff may continue to use such alternative service. The bill also requires community services boards to provide mental health and substance abuse services to individuals in local and regional correctional facilities and establishes a procedure for the delivery of services to individuals released from local and regional correctional facilities by the community services board serving the local or regional correctional facility or the community services board serving the county or city in which the individual will reside upon his release. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional facilities, local and regional; standards for mental health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N)
2018-02-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB878S1
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106800D-S1
2018-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-12SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2018-02-12SenateRead second time
2018-02-09SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-08SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
2018-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106800D-S1
2018-01-26SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-26SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104910D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372500(n/a)See Bill Text
53168(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback