VA SB875 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Solar energy projects; national standards. Authorizes a locality to include in its zoning ordinance provisions to incorporate generally accepted national standards for the use of solar panels and battery technologies for solar photovoltaic (electric energy) projects.
Title
Solar energy projects; national standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 402 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB875ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB875S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107535D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107535D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Local Government |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102705D |
Same As/Similar To
HB656 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)