VA SB873 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inspections prior to sale; exception; certain special orders. Exempts from the requirement that motor vehicles be inspected prior to retail sale transactions (i) a motor vehicle that is sold on the basis of a special order placed with a dealer or manufacturer outside the Commonwealth by a dealer who makes modifications to such vehicle prior to delivery to the first retail customer who takes delivery outside the Commonwealth or (ii) a new motor vehicle that has previously been inspected and displays a valid inspection sticker. For a new vehicle sold on the basis of a special order by a dealer on behalf of a nonresident, the bill expands the existing exception for an order placed with a manufacturer outside the Commonwealth to also exempt an order placed with a dealer outside the Commonwealth. The bill contains a technical amendment. This bill is identical to HB 627.
Title
Inspections prior to sale; exception, certain special orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB873ER) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18105048D-E |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB873E |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105048D |