VA SB870 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Small Estate Act; payment or delivery of small asset; disposition and funeral expenses. Requires any person having possession of a small asset belonging to a decedent, upon presentation of an affidavit by the funeral service establishment handling the disposition of the decedent and any related funeral service, to pay or deliver to such funeral service establishment so much of the small asset as does not exceed the amount given priority and has not already been paid. Under current law, such payment is discretionary and made to the undertaker or mortuary. The bill also provides for the discharge and release of a person paying or delivering a small asset in accordance with the provisions of the bill to the same extent as if such person dealt with the personal representative of the decedent. The bill provides that if any person to whom an affidavit is presented refuses to pay or deliver any small asset, such small asset may be recovered, payment or delivery compelled, and damages recovered, on proof of rightful claim, unless such refusal was made in good faith.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Small Estate Act; funeral expenses and disposition, refusal to pay or deliver small asset.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
2023-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24SenateSigned by President
2023-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB870ER)
2023-02-21SenateEnrolled
2023-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16HouseRead third time
2023-02-15HouseRead second time
2023-02-13HouseReported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-02-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
2023-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB870S1
2023-01-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23104750D-S1
2023-01-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-01-23SenateRead second time
2023-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 23104750D-S1
2023-01-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
2023-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102082D

Same As/Similar To

HB2128 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
HB2128 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
642604(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB870
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB870+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB870S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB870ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0414+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104750D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB870F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB870FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB870FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S12V0044+SB0870
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0093SB0870+SB0870
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0244+SB0870
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1894+SB0870

Bill Comments

feedback