VA SB869 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission; sunset. Extends the sunset date of the Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2020, and makes a technical correction to the reporting requirement of the Commission. This bill is identical to HB 1716.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission; sunset.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB869ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100479D |