VA SB866 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Boating safety course; database listing operators who have passed course. Directs the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries, by July 1, 2018, to create a database listing the name and date of birth and course passage date of every person who has passed an approved boating safety course prior to July 1, 2018. Any person who passes the course after that date may add his information to the database. The bill prohibits a law-enforcement officer from issuing a citation for failure to pass the required boating safety course until he has checked the database for the identity of the motorboat operator and provides that the listing of the operator in the database constitutes satisfactory evidence of having passed the required course.
Title
Boating safety course; database listing operators who have passed course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB866ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House (86-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB866S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104127D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104127D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101148D |