VA SB866 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance for local employees. Allows local school boards and local governing bodies to elect to have all their employees and retirees, as well as the dependents of employees and retirees, eligible to participate in the state employee health insurance plan. The local school boards and governing bodies shall be responsible for whatever portion of the cost of such insurance is not paid by the employee, except any portion that the General Assembly elects to pay. The school board and governing body of a given locality must both elect to participate in the state plan in order to for their employees to participate.
Title
Health insurance; school board allowed to elect to have employees & retirees to receive state plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB866S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104407D-S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB1075 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104407D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102399D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1075 (Similar To) 2015-01-28 - Incorporated by Finance