VA SB865 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Quality; reading diagnostic tests. Requires that the first reading diagnostic test administered to a student in kindergarten through grade three include a rapid alphabet naming component and that local school divisions report the results of reading diagnostic tests to parents, including subset scores.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Quality; reading diagnostic tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-02-01SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104396D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback