VA SB865 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Furnishing certain weapons to minor; exemption. Exempts the transfer of a dirk, switchblade knife, or bowie knife between family members or for the purpose of engaging in a sporting event or activity from the current prohibition against selling, bartering, giving, or furnishing such weapons to a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Furnishing certain weapons to minor; exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05SenateRequires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
2017-04-05SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateRequires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
2017-04-05SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N)
2017-03-16 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB865ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 40-N)
2017-02-22HousePassed House (59-Y 40-N)
2017-02-22HouseRead third time
2017-02-21HouseRead second time
2017-02-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
2017-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2017-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2017-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2017-01-18SenateReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
2016-12-07SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-12-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100757D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182309(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB865
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB865+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB865ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0058+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0075SB0865+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0100SB0865+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0138+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0312+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2682+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1128SB0865+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1129SB0865+SB0865
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1130SB0865+SB0865

Bill Comments

feedback