VA SB864 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electoral board appointments; chief judge of the judicial circuit or his designee to make appointment. Provides that appointments to the electoral board of each county and city are to be made by the chief judge of the judicial circuit for the county or city or that judge's designee, who shall be any other judge sitting in that judicial circuit. Currently, such appointments are made by a majority of the circuit judges and if a majority of the judges cannot agree, the senior judge makes the appointment. The bill also contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electoral board appointments; chief judge of judicial circuit or his designee make appointment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB864ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
2017-02-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
2017-02-17SenateSigned by President
2017-02-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB864ER)
2017-02-16SenateEnrolled
2017-02-14HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HouseRead third time
2017-02-13HouseRead second time
2017-02-10HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N)
2017-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31HouseAssigned P & E sub: Campaigns
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenatePrinted as engrossed 17100069D-E
2017-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB864E
2017-01-23SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Stuart agreed to
2017-01-23SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-01-23SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Stuart withdrawn
2017-01-23SenateRead second time
2017-01-20SenatePassed by for the day
2017-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N)
2016-12-07SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2016-12-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100069D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242106(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB864
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB864+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB864E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB864ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB864ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0807+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S08V0022+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0070SB0864+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0087SB0864+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1802V0019+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H18V0097+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2268+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1083SB0864+SB0864
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2905+SB0864

Bill Comments

feedback