VA SB860 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health care provider panels; vertically integrated carriers; public hospitals. Requires any vertically integrated carrier, which is a health insurer or other carrier that owns an interest in an acute care hospital facility, to offer to every public hospital the ability to participate in the provider panels or networks established for each of the carrier's policies, products, and plans.
Title
Health care provider panels; vertically integrated carriers, public hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Motion to pass by for the day rejected |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB860S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106595D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106595D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (10-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104204D |