VA SB858 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Department of Health Professions
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Naturopathic doctors; license required. Requires the Board of Medicine to license and regulate naturopathic doctors, defined in the bill as an individual, other than a doctor of medicine, osteopathy, chiropractic, or podiatry, who may diagnose, treat, and help prevent diseases using a system of practice that is based on the natural healing capacity of individuals, using physiological, psychological, or physical methods, and who may also use natural medicines, prescriptions, legend drugs, foods, herbs, or other natural remedies, including light and air.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naturopathic doctors; Board of Medicine to license and regulate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Department of Health Professions
2020-01-30SenatePassed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (10-Y 5-N)
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20106523D-S1
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105215D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412900(n/a)See Bill Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5412914(n/a)See Bill Text
5412956.14(n/a)See Bill Text
5412956.17(n/a)See Bill Text
5412973.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback