VA SB855 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Headlights; aftermarket modifications; blue lights. Prohibits the use of headlights on motor vehicles, motorcycles, autocycles, bicycles, electric personal assistive mobility devices, personal delivery devices, electric power-assisted bicycles, mopeds, and motorized skateboards or scooters with aftermarket modifications that make such headlights appear as a blue light. Headlights; aftermarket modifications; blue lights. Prohibits the use of headlights on motor vehicles, motorcycles, autocycles, bicycles, electric personal assistive mobility devices, personal delivery devices, electric power-assisted bicycles, mopeds, and motorized skateboards or scooters with aftermarket modifications that make such headlights appear as a blue light.
Title
Headlights; aftermarket modifications, blue lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB855ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House (87-Y 11-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23101439D-E |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB855E |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 1-N) |
2022-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101439D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |