VA SB854 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund. Abolishes the Capital Access Fund for Disadvantaged Businesses, which provides loan guarantees, loan loss reserves, and interest rate write-downs for disadvantaged businesses, and replaces it with the Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund. The new fund will provide direct loans to eligible small, women-owned, and minority-owned businesses. The bill requires the Small Business Financing Authority and the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to transfer cash balances in the Capital Access Fund for Disadvantaged Businesses to the Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB854ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House with amendments (87-Y 12-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103108D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1757 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 213.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2311.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |