VA SB853 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance agents; continuing education requirements. Revises the provisions applicable to the deadlines by which insurance agents are required to comply with continuing education requirements applicable to licensed insurance agents. The measure also revises provisions regarding licensees who are exempt from continuing education requirements. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019.
Title
Insurance agents; continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 668 (effective 1/1/19) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB853ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104024D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1868.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1869 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1871 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1872 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |