VA SB851 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary injunctions. Provides that, in assessing whether to award a temporary injunction, a court shall review the following factors: (i) the likelihood of irreparable harm to the party seeking the temporary injunction if the temporary injunction is denied; (ii) the likelihood of harm to the party not seeking the temporary injunction if the temporary injunction is granted; (iii) the likelihood that the party seeking the temporary injunction will succeed on the merits; and (iv) the public interest.
Title
Temporary injunctions; considerations in awarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N) (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 12-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103236D-E | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB851E | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103236D |