VA SB85 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Preliminary protective orders; contents of order. Provides that if a preliminary protective order is issued in an ex parte hearing where the petition for the order is supported by sworn testimony and not an affidavit or a form completed by a law-enforcement officer that includes a statement of the grounds for the order, the court issuing the order shall state in the order the basis on which the order was entered, including a summary of the allegations made and the court's findings.
Title
Protective orders, preliminary; contents of order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-03-02 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100388D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |