VA SB847 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate 73 Transportation Compact. Creates the Interstate 73 Transportation Compact to develop and plan the Interstate 73 corridor, advocate for federal and other funding resources for the project, and facilitate plans and programs for the project between the signatory states. The bill establishes the Interstate 73 Transportation Compact Commission, which shall include a seven-member delegation from Virginia, meet at least twice annually, and annually report on its activities to the Governor and the legislature of each signatory state. Such compact shall not become effective until enacted by at least one other signatory state and consented to by Congress.
Title
Interstate 73 Transportation Compact; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective - see bill) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB847ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 15105152D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (87-Y 11-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB847H1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105152D-H1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105152D-H1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB847S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104502D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104502D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101343D |