VA SB842 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Petition for modification of sentence; eligibility; procedures. Provides a petition process for a person serving a sentence for any conviction or a combination of any convictions who remains incarcerated in a state or local correctional facility and meets certain criteria to petition the circuit court that entered the original judgment or order to (i) suspend the unserved portion of such sentence or run the unserved portion of such sentence concurrently with another sentence, (ii) place such person on probation for such time as the court shall determine, or (iii) otherwise modify the sentence imposed. Petition for modification of sentence; eligibility; procedures. Provides a petition process for a person serving a sentence for any conviction or a combination of any convictions who remains incarcerated in a state or local correctional facility and meets certain criteria to petition the circuit court that entered the original judgment or order to (i) suspend the unserved portion of such sentence or run the unserved portion of such sentence concurrently with another sentence, (ii) place such person on probation for such time as the court shall determine, or (iii) otherwise modify the sentence imposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petition for modification of sentence; eligibility, procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2023-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-02-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
2023-02-03SenatePrinted as engrossed 23103532D-E
2023-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB842E
2023-02-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2023-02-03SenateRead second time
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 3-N)
2023-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-25SenateReported from Judiciary (8-Y 6-N)
2022-12-28SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2022-12-28SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103532D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192303.03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB842
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB842+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB842E+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105738A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB842AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB842F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB842FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0087+SB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0221+SB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0212SB0842+SB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0257SB0842+SB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0223+SB0842

Bill Comments

feedback