VA SB840 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Persons acquitted by reason of insanity. Makes various changes to the provisions regarding confinement hearings and conditional release procedures for persons who have been acquitted of a violent felony by reason of insanity. Under current law, such provisions do not distinguish between persons acquitted of a violent felony or any other felony offense.
Title
Insanity; persons acquitted.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108536D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB840S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107405D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107405D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100988D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 182.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 182.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 182.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |