VA SB84 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Voluntary admission for mental health treatment. Provides that a person may be voluntarily admitted to a facility for mental health treatment after issuance of a temporary detention order but before a hearing for involuntary commitment by the person's attending or consulting physician where the physician finds that the person is willing and able to volunteer for treatment and after the person is informed that they will be required to provide 48 hours notice prior to leaving the facility to which they are voluntarily admitted and will be prohibited from owning, possessing, or transporting a firearm. This bill also provides that a hearing for involuntary commitment shall be held no less than 24 hours but no more than 72 hours after execution of a temporary detention order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary admission; person admitted to facility for mental health treatment after detention order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-02 Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
2010-02-08 Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2010-01-18 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
2010-01-05 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-01-05 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100479D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192169.6(n/a)See Bill Text
192176(n/a)See Bill Text
192182.9(n/a)See Bill Text
372805(n/a)See Bill Text
372809(n/a)See Bill Text
372813(n/a)See Bill Text
372814(n/a)See Bill Text
372819(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback